Financial history ANTIOCH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1136907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £77.05k £77.60k £100.92k £119.53k £130.81k
Total expenditure £87.17k £73.34k £99.76k £112.43k £133.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A