Financial history CODYS - ALSO KNOWN AS CODYS PRODUCTIONS, CHESHIRE OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC YOUTH SET AND CODYS SINGING ALOUD

Charity number: 1143016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.60k £32.13k £14.48k £25.21k £26.80k
Total expenditure £52.98k £23.81k £30.56k £23.48k £26.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.10k N/A N/A N/A