Financial history THE PREMIER LEAGUE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 1137208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £40.51m £30.19m £32.99m £39.70m £39.39m
Total expenditure £34.58m £33.56m £34.62m £36.86m £37.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £40.36m £30.18m £32.92m £39.01m £38.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £144.76k £8.60k £66.76k £688.67k £1.30m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £34.58m £33.56m £34.62m £36.86m £37.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.92k £14.40k £19.80k £20.40k £25.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £31.32m £30.18m £31.28m £32.77m £32.65m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0