Financial history THE CHANTRY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1137554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £122.58k £101.03k £98.55k £191.71k £99.61k
Total expenditure £125.14k £61.31k £89.15k £86.72k £106.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £44.34k £9.83k £74.24k £9.69k