Trustees HOLMFIRTH ART & MUSIC LIMITED
Charity number: 1141623

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helena Elizabeth Sydor Lyons | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Gunning | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ansell | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Crowther | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wright | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Massett | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Margaret Marion McEwan | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Buchanan | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mason-Dixon | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Lawson | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Mary Bradley | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.