Trustees DERBYSHIRE BAT CONSERVATION GROUP
Charity number: 1139339

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN ALAN ROE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Tucker | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Jackson | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Athorn | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Bennett | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Lehup | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Shervill | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Kathleen Cross | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Towle | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bernard Roe | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Suzie Hill | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MARTIN WRAGG | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.