BHAKTI DHAM WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE HINDU FAITH AND TRADITION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WALES.(VISHNU SAHASRANAM RECITATION) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN INDIAN ART, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS.(BRINGING ARTISTS,YOGA CLASSES) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE INDIAN COMMUNITY LIVING IN WALES.? .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

32 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- Newport City
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 18 January 2011: Standard registration
- BDW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chetna Sinha | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|||||
RADHIKA KADABA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|||||
KESHAV SWARNKAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUDHIR RAMCHANDRA SARNOBAT | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr KODANDA R NAGARAJA RAO | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
NISHEBITA DAS | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
NARASINGRAO MUJUMDAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Rawindaran V N P Nair | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARUN KUMAR SINHA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
ROGEIRO KUMAR VERMA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kishore Kale | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAJESH TEWARY | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Renu Sinha | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALOKMOY SINHA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
SANTOSH KUMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
VIVEK KUMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
SUCHITRA DASMOHAPATRA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr MEENAKSHI SARNOBAT | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
ANITA SINHA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
RABINDRA KUMAR MAHAPATRA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
KADABA NARAYANAN RAJKUMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr UPENDRA KUMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
SHELADEVI K NAIR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
MANISHA KALE | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
SUDHIR KUMAR SINHA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
MAMTA TEWARY | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
CHITRA RANI | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
SHEFALINI ROGIERO VERMA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
AMITA MITRA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
ABHIJIT MITRA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
RAJ LAKSHMI SINHA | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANVITA SWARNKAR | Trustee | 27 June 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £5.92k | £9.31k | £15.21k | £28.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.97k | £6.77k | £7.90k | £10.84k | £25.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED ON 08 JAN 2011 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAR 2017 as amended on 02 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
= TO ADVANCE THE HINDU FAITH AND TRADITION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WALES. = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN INDIAN ART, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS. = TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE INDIAN COMMUNITY LIVING IN WALES.
Area of benefit
WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SHEPLEY COURT
HEOL ISAF
RADYR
CARDIFF
CF15 8DX
- Phone:
- 02922417705
- Email:
- bhaktidhamwales@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window