Trustees LEEDS YOUTH OPERA
Charity number: 1139608

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM JOHN LYNCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lisa Clare Devine | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bronia Suzanne Daniels | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christina Ann Edwards | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Wood | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STANILAND | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Anne Rushton | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Limb | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Limb | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.