Financial history POLICE FIREARMS OFFICERS ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1139247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £535.50k £513.70k £599.15k £617.02k £681.10k
Total expenditure £449.66k £493.33k £686.07k £692.84k £675.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A £88 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £505.90k £507.94k £598.12k £604.09k £663.50k
Income - Other trading activities £1.18k £1.23k £858 £11.46k £12.74k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.42k £781 £79 £1.47k £4.87k
Income - Other £25.00k £3.74k £88 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £598.12k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £444.24k £493.33k £495.83k £652.86k £627.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.43k £0 £0 £35.23k £32.40k
Expenditure - Governance £11.71k £5.15k £0 £40.52k £26.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £190.24k £4.76k £15.45k