Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. MICHAEL AT THE NORTHGATE CHURCH
Charity Number: 1148900

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Charles Raven | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr AUDREY SOUTHGATE | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Eve Hitchens | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
David Jonathan Elliott | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Myriam Burstow | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Thomas Dixon | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Daniel Martin-Thomas | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
John Smallman | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Andrew Spicer | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Anthony Buckley | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Lebus | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||
PATRICIA CAROL EARL | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTIN PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PRUDENCE MARY DAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PENELOPE ANNE WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.