PARKSIDE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Trust are to advance the education of the pupils at The Parkside School, to advance the education of other members of the community, and otherwise to benefit the community, it being acknowledged that in carrying out the Objects the Trust must (where applicable) have regard to its obligation to promote community cohesion under the Education Acts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frederick Joseph | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Hobbs | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Claxton | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARRY PAYNE | Trustee | 14 October 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 October 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 February 2022 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS AT THE PARKSIDE SCHOOL, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, AND OTHERWISE TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY, IT BEING ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THE OBJECTS THE TRUST MUST (WHERE APPLICABLE) HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARKSIDE SCHOOL
COLLEGE ROAD
NORWICH
NR2 3JA
- Phone:
- 01603441126
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window