Financial history LEWISHAM PENSIONERS' GAZETTE LIMITED

Charity number: 1139984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £3 £5
Total expenditure £60 £260 £465 £72 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A