Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, WARLEY, ANGLICAN DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Charity number: 1138758

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dawn Marie Butcher | Chair | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Jane Edwin | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Dora Le Rasle | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Watts BA | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Fisher | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Kearns | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olive Edna Law | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Jane Galliers | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HEDLEY KETTLEWELL BA CPFA | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK VINCENT CHARLES TOWNSEND | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDON STUART HORROCKS | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MAUREEN PARTRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.