Financial history PRO-ACTIVE LIFESTYLE WATER ACTIVITIES CLUB

Charity Number: 1142283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.12k £5.10k £19.69k £28.49k £30.17k
Total expenditure £63.16k £5.25k £23.06k £24.73k £26.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A