Trustees PRO-ACTIVE LIFESTYLE WATER ACTIVITIES CLUB
Charity Number: 1142283

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOYCE FISHER | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stentiford | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morag Penrose | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Susan Woodley | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ware | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE HULL | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anna Toeman | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Barbara Middleton | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN STROUD | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ROBINSON | Trustee | 25 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER WELLSTOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.