SHALFORD CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Formed in 1905 to participate in the first Leith Hill Musical Festival and, except in World Wars, every year since. We are an enthusiastic choir who invites singers who desire to sing choral music without need of audition. This season we gave a Christmas Concert with a collection for St Mary?s Church. We also performed carols in Guildford High Street and a local care home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 09 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1109754 BLACKHEATH & BRAMLEY CHORAL SOCIETY
- 09 September 2022: Funds transferred to 275176 LEITH HILL MUSICAL FESTIVAL
- 09 September 2022: Funds transferred to 254800 THE GODALMING CHORAL SOCIETY
- 09 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1128468 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- NO (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84k | £12.00k | £13.47k | £979 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £12.66k | £13.20k | £183 | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN THE SHALFORD AREA AND ELSEWHERE BY MEANS OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, OR OTHERWISE, AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE PARTICIPATION IN THE LEITH HILL MUSIC FESTIVAL (LHMF). TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. TO PROVIDE A VENUE, AND THE OPPORTUNITY, FOR ALL WHO LIKE TO SING, LEARN AND PRACTICE
Area of benefit
SHALFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window