The Healthy Heart Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of medical knowledge and research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 November 2010: Standard registration
- 01 July 2011: Funds received from 1053551 CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH TRUST
- THE CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH TRUST (Previous name)
- The Cardiovascular Research Trust the Healthy Heart Charity (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David Julian Alexander Goldsmith | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Carlo Digrandi | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicola Rachel Aubury | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Edward Clark | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Rosalind Stetson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Parvinder Gidday | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kritika Kalia | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Albert Ferro | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Verity Elizabeth Algar | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasvinder Sethi | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mehul Nathwani | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Katy Morecombe | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Man Yung CHEUNG | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £40 | £11.71k | £1.84k | £10.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.70k | £243 | £3.94k | £16.55k | £14.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2010 as amended on 22 May 2020 as amended on 07 Sep 2021 as amended on 10 Aug 2023 as amended on 02 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
The promotion of education and research into the causes, prevention of and treatment of and for heart disease and other disorders for which there are underlying causes in common.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Franklin-Wilkins Building Room 3.07
150 Stamford Street
LONDON
SE1 9NH
- Phone:
- 02089977162
- Email:
- john@stjohn1.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window