THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BILSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
promoting in the Ecclesiastical Parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelical, social and ecumenical. The PCC is also spiritually responsible for the maintenance of the Church complex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 11 November 2010: Standard registration
- BILSTON TEAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Satwinder Peake | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Chineze Okoye | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Spencer | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mavis Heath | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Janice Hawkins | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Helen Susan Bircher | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kay Andrea Edwards | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Giane Rice | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Eber Wilfred Carter | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Peta Diane Woodberry | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW BIRCHER | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Kerry Bircher | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARK LEONARD BIRCHER | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MARY DOOLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP DOOLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES ARTHUR SMITH | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Valerie Mills | Trustee | 29 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.97k | £131.01k | £95.17k | £124.61k | £180.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.39k | £141.99k | £133.42k | £85.16k | £128.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Leonards C Of E Church
Walsall Street
BILSTON
West Midlands
WV14 0AT
- Phone:
- 01902757045
- Email:
- kimchurches7@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window