Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BILSTON
Charity number: 1138955

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Satwinder Peake | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Chineze Okoye | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Spencer | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mavis Heath | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Janice Hawkins | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Helen Susan Bircher | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kay Andrea Edwards | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Giane Rice | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Eber Wilfred Carter | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Peta Diane Woodberry | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW BIRCHER | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Kerry Bircher | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARK LEONARD BIRCHER | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MARY DOOLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP DOOLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES ARTHUR SMITH | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Valerie Mills | Trustee | 29 April 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.