Financial history UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1139656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.12m £3.87m £6.06m £6.68m £6.82m
Total expenditure £4.87m £3.73m £5.91m £6.34m £6.67m
Income from government contracts £1.05k £300 £535 N/A £1.08k
Income from government grants £78.57k £16.40k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.64m £2.68m £3.12m £3.49m £3.26m
Income - Other trading activities £81.24k £0 £0 £127.89k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.34m £1.19m £2.94m £3.06m £3.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.95k £4.23k £4.91k £12.36k £59.51k
Income - Other £53.68k £1.05k £58 £0 £173
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.80m £3.73m £5.91m £6.34m £6.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.28k £31.93k £35.05k £43.57k £38.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £62.54k £0 £0 £0 £11.11k