NOTTINGHAM FOREST COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nottingham Forest Football Club in the Community deliver high quality football, physical activity and education programmes to people of all ages and abilities in Nottingham and across the county.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,060,950
Donations and legacies | £85.47k | |
Charitable activities | £1.95m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.20k | |
Other | £17.36k |
Total expenditure:
£1,926,289
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £17,500 from 1 government contract(s) and £578,455 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.93m | |
Retained for future use | £134.66k |
People

56 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- China
- United States
Governance
- 29 December 2010: Standard registration
- NOTTINGHAM FOREST IN THE COMMUNITY; NOTTINGHAM FOREST IN THE CITY (Working name)
- NOTTINGHAM FOREST FOOTBALL CLUB IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Mayled | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh White | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Whysall | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iqbal Singh Sanghera | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Ann Lyons | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Randall QC | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21m | £1.29m | £2.08m | £2.31m | £2.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23m | £1.13m | £1.99m | £2.29m | £1.93m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £135.95k | £99.26k | £67.50k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £80.00k | £109.76k | £932.80k | £983.88k | £578.46k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £249.01k | £178.92k | £98.40k | £78.81k | £85.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £934.08k | £993.97k | £1.94m | £2.22m | £1.95m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.28k | £3.24k | £4.56k | £6.29k | £11.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £19.90k | £117.47k | £36.11k | £12.50k | £17.36k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.23m | £1.13m | £1.99m | £2.29m | £1.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £60.92k | £58.43k | £128.69k | £92.53k | £84.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.68k | £14.64k | £9.66k | £11.26k | £8.59k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £862.33k | £1.24m | £1.30m | £1.54m | £1.83m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £299.58k | £503.36k | £456.76k | £683.64k | £838.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1 TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF PEOPLE; 2 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE ACROSS THE UK AND IN THE EAST MIDLANDS IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR RESOURCES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS; 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE ACROSS THE UK AND IN THE EAST MIDLANDS IN PARTICULAR, BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING FACILITIES FOR LEARNING, IN PARTICULAR, LITERACY AND NUMERACY SKILLS; 4 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY ACROSS THE UK AND IN THE EAST MIDLANDS IN PARTICULAR, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; AND 6 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE THAT THE DIRECTORS, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ACROSS THE UK AND IN THE EAST MIDLANDS IN PARTICULAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOTTINGHAM FOREST FOOTBALL CLUB
PAVILION ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 5FJ
- Phone:
- 01159824318
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window