Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SEBASTIAN, WOKINGHAM
Charity number: 1139933

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rickey Simpson-Gray | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Andrews | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel James Wickens | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Donald Mackenzie | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Metson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Bull | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lorraine Wickens | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Morrison | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Birch | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Smart | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Beatrice Unwin | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET FRANCES ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.