Financial history FRIENDS OF THE DARTMOOR HILL PONY

Charity number: 1141045
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.74k £44.79k £55.43k £56.78k £68.62k
Total expenditure £51.99k £47.53k £59.29k £56.18k £61.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A