MELTON LEARNING HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to act as a resource for young people up to the age of 25 living in Melton Borough and the surrounding area, by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities. Aiming to advance education, relieve unemployment and reduce anti-social behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£749,614
Donations and legacies | £176.66k | |
Charitable activities | £564.31k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £7.02k | |
Other | £1.62k |
Total expenditure:
£743,455
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £743.46k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £44,685 from 1 government contract(s) and £23,165 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £743.46k | |
Retained for future use | £6.16k |
People

17 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
- MELTON HUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Saxby | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Frederick clements | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Johnson Whittingham | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Treadwell | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven William Taylor | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Mary Theobald | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGARET MOORE | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA POSNETT CC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £677.98k | £713.11k | £702.64k | £797.87k | £749.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £590.98k | £592.24k | £623.37k | £716.08k | £743.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £44.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | £180.26k | £228.24k | £216.78k | £73.52k | £23.17k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £266.19k | £317.16k | £220.74k | £268.88k | £176.66k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £411.50k | £393.47k | £477.49k | £526.55k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £170 | £2.47k | £4.35k | £0 | £564.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £131 | £10 | £54 | £2.44k | £7.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.62k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £590.98k | £592.24k | £623.37k | £716.08k | £743.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £44.74k | £45.23k | £34.24k | £22.92k | £4.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £32.39k | £32.94k | £86.37k | £99.78k | £90.36k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £436.86k | £556.59k | £582.97k | £671.18k | £753.62k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.10k | £2.51k | £3.05k | £22.88k | £89.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN MELTON BOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITES A A MENS OF: ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THIER SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPOSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; ADVANCING EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND WIDER COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, NOT REQUIRES TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY IN ANY OF THE LOCAL SCHOOLS AND WHICH ARE OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE; RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO ARE SEEKING FULL OR PART TIME EMPLOYMENT ; AND PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
MELTON BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURTON ROAD
MELTON MOWBRAY
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE13 1DJ
- Phone:
- 01664564967
- Email:
- sarah.cox@mlh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window