Financial history MOHAMMADI TRUST BIRMINGHAM

Charity Number: 1140712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £156.31k £121.38k £276.68k £212.79k £152.61k
Total expenditure £166.42k £52.87k £44.37k £44.04k £68.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.58k £4.36k N/A N/A