Financial history FRIENDS OF GARRICK GREEN

Charity number: 1139753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.56k £8.00k £13.62k £14.86k £8.06k
Total expenditure £4.11k £2.59k £7.39k £16.24k £15.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A