Financial history THE CONSTITUTION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1139515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £141.43k £12.75k £14.48k £18.05k £90.92k
Total expenditure £217.12k £108.88k £168.28k £164.70k £158.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.75k £2.26k N/A N/A N/A