RUGBY FOR HEROES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial and personal support to servicemen and women to help them make the transition from military service back into civilian life. This includes designated transition courses using the sport of Rugby as a means to assist with this transition process as well as providing financial support to individuals & other like minded charities by way of a formal grant application process.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Bailey | Chair | 13 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Kraus | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Moss | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Miles Alastair Greenslade | Trustee | 02 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Paul Quant | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.83k | £80.96k | £186.34k | £259.51k | £150.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.37k | £78.26k | £181.42k | £257.92k | £132.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST SERVING AND FORMER SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN TO: 1. RESETTLE AND REHABILITATE INTO CIVILIAN LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE, TRAINING, FUNDING AND OTHER SUPPORT TO HELP THEM PREPARE FOR A CIVILIAN CAREER AND GAIN EMPLOYMENT. 2. PROVIDE RELIEF FROM THE EFFECTS OF DISABILITY OR OTHER INJURY SUFFERED WHILST SERVING AS A MEMBER OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Adjacency Recruitment Ltd
Darwin House
67 Rodney Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 1HX
- Phone:
- 01242 904406
- Email:
- INFO@RUGBYFORHEROES.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window