Financial history MINDOUT LGB&T MENTAL HEALTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1140098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £470.57k £697.76k £666.27k £793.10k £508.48k
Total expenditure £472.55k £499.26k £642.36k £854.04k £771.92k
Income from government contracts £58.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.41k £15.28k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £290.93k £350.42k £350.42k £322.10k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £406.29k £315.57k £315.57k £185.23k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £536 £279 £279 £1.16k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £470.01k £599.02k £794.41k £753.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £29.25k £43.34k £59.63k £18.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.81k £8.98k £11.84k £8.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0