THURROCK U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thurrock U3A is a stand alone group providing interests and activities for those (men and women) over 55 and not in full time employment.We encourage people to get together with the aim of learning new hobbies/skills and making friends. We believe that retirement shouldn't mean 'slippers and soaps'. People ofter join Thurrock U3A because they are lonely, once a member they are never alone again.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Thurrock
Governance
- 10 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Heasmer | Chair | 26 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Lalji Patel | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James William Brewster | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Revell | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Irene Ottley | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Doreen Hood | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Elaine Lamberth | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Simpson | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Thwaites | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Bygate | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kay Hatter | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERRY HURLEY | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cutler | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hallums | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Lewis | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA HURLEY | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Quilter | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Hopkins | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.58k | £5.86k | £4.56k | £12.09k | £13.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.08k | £5.78k | £8.39k | £10.07k | £10.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE: I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN THURROCK AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. II)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE. (OPTIONAL)
Area of benefit
THURROCK AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Edward Close
Chafford Hundred
GRAYS
Essex
RM16 6GZ
- Phone:
- 07792229333
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window