KINGSTON 3A ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly (in term time) rehearsals leading to concerts twice or three times a year open to public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 February 2011: Standard registration
- KINGSTON 3A ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- KINGSTON U3A ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Lianos | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Law | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Bulmer | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Pocock | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PERRY DUNCAN CRISPIN NEWENT KITCHEN | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Peter Anning | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.56k | £10.20k | £14.91k | £14.68k | £15.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.13k | £9.98k | £15.76k | £13.77k | £15.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Landford Road
Putney
London
London
SW15 1AQ
- Phone:
- 02087856880
- Website:
-
kingstonthirdageorchestra.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window