Financial history HARBOUR COMMUNITY CHURCH, FOLKESTONE

Charity number: 1140131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £152.33k £137.09k £160.84k £166.84k £192.17k
Total expenditure £126.00k £159.88k £156.90k £153.08k £188.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A