Financial history FAVERSHAM COMMUNITY GYMNASTIC AND ACTIVITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1139679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £453.41k £176.45k £271.52k £393.29k £439.39k
Total expenditure £529.85k £372.88k £508.71k £526.25k £495.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.13k N/A N/A