Trustees THE LEICESTER PHILHARMONIC CHOIR
Charity number: 501551

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Garnett | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Watts | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Worsfold | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Mary Bevin | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Claire O'Neill | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Clare Thorpe | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Shirley Godber | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARSTON | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
KIM PEAKE | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.