Financial history MUSICPLACE NORTH-WEST LIMITED

Charity number: 1143131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £53.96k £53.04k £83.74k £82.91k £91.91k
Total expenditure £61.25k £58.87k £75.13k £81.92k £101.38k
Income from government contracts N/A £38.75k £29.53k £10.29k £4.45k
Income from government grants £2.48k £3.62k £30.00k N/A N/A