LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1141797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

LQPT's prime objective is to advance the religious purposes of Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) Great Britain. To achieve this, its main activity is to maintain, repair, preserve and insure the Quaker Meeting Houses, and other properties within the London area and to help pay for rented accommodation where appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LQPT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nathan Burnikell Trustee 01 January 2025
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Judith Ann Roads Trustee 15 May 2024
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Robert James Campbell Smith Trustee 17 March 2024
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Caroline Nursey Trustee 01 January 2024
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Catherine Bacon Trustee 17 September 2023
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Dugan Cummings Trustee 23 July 2023
None on record
Robert Stephen Page Trustee 25 March 2023
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
George Barrow Trustee 01 January 2023
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Anne Wilkinson Trustee 01 October 2022
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
John Smith Trustee 14 March 2021
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Linda Craig Trustee 01 January 2020
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Charles Trustee 01 January 2020
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Martin Trustee 23 July 2018
POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.70m £3.71m £1.09m £1.46m £1.69m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.90m £1.72m £1.37m £1.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £106.82k £57.41k £187.58k £75.48k £70.50k
Income - Other trading activities £30.70k £6.71k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.38m £650.43k £740.63k £1.17m £1.36m
Income - Endowments £70.00k £0 £0 £0 £53.00k
Income - Investment £179.59k £175.71k £148.69k £201.80k £254.09k
Income - Other £0 £2.81m £8.25k £19.49k £4.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.61m £1.38m £1.33m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.72k £22.24k £29.49k £40.96k £44.46k
Expenditure - Governance £12.96k £7.80k £13.80k £18.94k £12.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.72k £22.24k £29.49k £5.59k £5.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £264.00k £315.00k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £27.89m £30.16m £28.42m £28.42m £28.42m
Long-term investments £4.77m £5.14m £7.93m £8.24m £6.73m
Other assets £4.12m £3.53m £2.76m £2.81m £3.76m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £90.39k £388.42k £202.26k £170.36k £70.65k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 16 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS QUAKERS) GREAT BRITAIN AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) TO MAINTAIN REPAIR PRESERVE AND INSURE QUAKER MEETING HOUSES AND OTHER PROPERTIES OWNED OR USED BY QUAKERS IN GREAT BRITAIN TOGETHER WITH THEIR CONTENTS.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 06 August 2018 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
FRIENDS HOUSE
173-177 EUSTON ROAD
LONDON
NW1 2BJ
Phone:
02076631065
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available