Financial history SHREWSBURY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 501644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £23.39k £13.76k £2.67k £25.93k £32.92k
Total expenditure £26.09k £13.76k £1.14k £28.83k £33.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A N/A N/A