Trustees SHREWSBURY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 501644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER WORLEY Chair 17 November 2022
None on record
Nicola Ford Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Rhiannon Jarman Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Kate Stephens Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Jonathan Bruton Trustee 30 September 2018
TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (SHREWSBURY)
Received: On time
Pushkar Trivedi Trustee 30 September 2014
None on record
VERONICA WHITE Trustee
None on record