ST JOHN'S COLLEGE, DURHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for the education and training of candidates for Holy Orders in the Church of England and other Christian ministries and to advance the education of men and women .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£7,386,952
Donations and legacies | £1.84m | |
Charitable activities | £4.89m | |
Other trading activities | £423.80k | |
Investments | £228.36k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,000,151
Raising funds | £159.18k | |
Charitable activities | £6.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£290,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £159.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.84m | |
Retained for future use | £386.80k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £159.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.84m | |
Retained for future use | £676.80k |
People

98 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
68 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marija Huljak | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Grace Martin | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Killen | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Boulton Ward | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Revd Dr Nicholas James Moore | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Helen Sutton | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jolyon Mitchell | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Stephenson | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Courtman | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Judson | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLARE LOUISE CURRAN | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Anthony Meyer Dale | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fungai Catherine Ngangira | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amir Michael | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|||||
RT REV DR Robert Neil Innes | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Bouveng | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michel Anthony Higton | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Canon Dr JAMES HERBERT HARRISON | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL JOHN GILMORE | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43m | £5.41m | £6.01m | £6.47m | £7.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39m | £5.01m | £5.13m | £5.67m | £7.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £564.67k | £1.62m | £1.53m | £1.70m | £1.84m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £259.52k | £67.05k | £230.83k | £242.59k | £423.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.16m | £3.33m | £3.87m | £3.97m | £4.89m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £97.02k | £48.26k | £109.04k | £148.72k | £228.36k | |
|
Income - Other | £348.70k | £342.62k | £276.33k | £413.98k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £500 | £250 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.11m | £4.93m | £4.92m | £5.44m | £6.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £277.54k | £84.25k | £217.90k | £225.35k | £159.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £45.87k | £39.60k | £50.73k | £0 | £22.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £76.97k | £329.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £21.91m | £21.65m | £21.38m | £20.56m | £17.88m | |
|
Long-term investments | £764.20k | £911.73k | £901.33k | £885.14k | £3.70m | |
|
Other assets | £1.32m | £2.14m | £3.32m | £3.58m | £4.24m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.86m | £3.04m | £3.07m | £2.54m | £2.66m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JANUARY 1911 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS THE LAST RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 24 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
OBJECTS 3 THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 3.1 TO PROVIDE IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A COLLEGE OR COLLEGES IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM, FOR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND OTHER CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES, IN CONFORMITY WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WHICH IS UNIQUELY REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES SET FORTH IN THE CATHOLIC CREEDS, AND TO WHICH THE HISTORIC FORMULARIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BEAR WITNESS, AND TAKING PARTICULAR INSPIRATION FROM AND ROOTED IN THE PROTESTANT HERITAGE AND EVANGELICAL TRADITION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 3.2 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN A CHRISTIAN SETTING OF MEN AND WOMEN - FROM ALL BACKGROUNDS AND BELIEFS AND OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE - AT THE COLLEGE OR COLLEGES OF THE COMPANY, ENABLING THEM TO UNDERTAKE A COURSE OF STUDY AND/OR RESEARCH IN A RANGE OF SUBJECTS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SERVICES (INCLUDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, PASTORAL CARE AND EXTRAMURAL ENRICHMENT).
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS COLLEGE
3 SOUTH BAILEY
DURHAM
DH1 3RJ
- Phone:
- 01913343500
- Email:
- johns.secretary@durham.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window