Financial history THE PAMELA EDMUNDSON/CONNOLLY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1141006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £26.47k £18.68k £24.63k £22.83k £24.35k
Total expenditure £35.09k £64.88k £39.06k £16.26k £50.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A