THE MAYOR OF LONDON'S FUND FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity number: 1141216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Trading as the "London Music Fund", the charity awards Scholarships to children with musical potential and commitment to learning an instrument, whose families are unable to afford the ongoing cost of tuition. It also funds Partnerships between music hubs, schools and professional arts organisations, addressing specific gaps in provision. Applications are only accepted from London Music Hubs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LONDON MUSIC FUND (Working name)
  • MAYOR'S MUSIC FUND (Working name)
  • MFYM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Baroness Fleet Veronica Wadley CBE Chair 06 April 2011
None on record
ROXANA-VIORICA MIRICA Trustee 02 November 2023
THE APAX FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Peter Micahel Glaser Trustee 03 September 2023
None on record
Mary Jane Mycroft Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
James Nicholas Marsh Trustee 10 July 2022
None on record
Alethea Chia Jung Siow Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Howard Mason Trustee 09 February 2021
THE EDMUND TRUST
Received: On time
Richard John Ewbank Trustee 09 February 2021
None on record
Alexander James Kwame George Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Katya Gorbatiouk Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Kevin Leslie Gardiner Trustee 27 February 2019
None on record
Emma Chamberlain OBE Trustee 23 May 2018
None on record
Oliver Duff Trustee 21 April 2016
None on record
Richard Morris Trustee 06 April 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £444.04k £518.67k £674.43k £696.65k £703.90k
Total expenditure £234.50k £608.04k £648.31k £681.65k £640.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.00k £26.00k £26.00k £23.88k £63.88k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £355.99k £502.83k £566.52k £591.37k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £157.41k £157.33k £118.89k £78.79k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £5.27k £0 £11.25k £33.74k
Income - Other N/A £0 £14.27k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £15.50k £29.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £571.20k £589.40k £637.12k £573.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £36.84k £58.91k £44.53k £67.23k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.41k £8.30k £9.55k £12.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £322.74k £439.01k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets N/A £0 £0 £115.82k £159.47k
Long-term investments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A £709.94k £903.04k £974.51k £996.96k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £586.58k £753.56k £925.84k £928.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 25 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 15 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
169 Union Street
London
SE1 0LL
Phone:
020 7983 4258