Financial history JAPAN ASSOCIATION IN THE UK

Charity number: 1145493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £66.41k £49.35k £67.83k £65.09k £67.73k
Total expenditure £56.24k £42.62k £48.87k £58.36k £73.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0