THE CHORAL FOUNDATION, THE CHAPEL ROYAL, HAMPTON COURT PALACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Choral Foundation preserves and promotes the unique heritage of English choral music at the Chapel Royal Hampton Court Palace by making it accessible to all. Activities include raising funds through personal donations, events income, fundraising concerts, trusts and foundations, legacy giving, sponsorship, partnerships and scholarship bursaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Louise Crowther | Chair | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gent | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin John McElwee | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Wood | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Elaine Goodier-Rowlands | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sarah Vanni | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon William Temple James | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Simon Mark Basini | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Alexander MacDougall | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER SCULLY | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD FARRAR ROTHWELL | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.07k | £49.50k | £121.18k | £80.24k | £176.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.91k | £31.50k | £41.70k | £95.41k | £78.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY THE MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF A CHOIR THROUGH THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHORISTERS AND BY MAINTAINING THE CHORAL TRADITIONS OF THE CHAPEL ROYAL; (2) TO PROMOTE THE ART OF CHORAL MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHORISTERS OF THE CHAPEL ROYAL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Hampton Court Palace
East Molesey
KT8 9AU
- Phone:
- 02031666516
- Email:
- Choral.Foundation@hrp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window