BBYO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH EDUCATION, LEADERSHIP TRAINING AND UNDERSTANDING OF JUDAISM AMONGST JEWISH TEENAGERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN SUCH MANNER AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE AND; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Camden
- Hertfordshire
- Manchester City
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD JONATHAN DAVID MORRIS OF KENWOOD | Chair | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Elisabeth Benoliel | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Livingston | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ashley Allen-Harris | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Epstein | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Jane Lewis | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Benjamin Robinson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306.27k | £124.78k | £218.28k | £421.28k | £441.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.20k | £115.86k | £189.37k | £455.98k | £424.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.43k | £38.79k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH EDUCATION, LEADERSHIP TRAINING AND UNDERSTANDING OF JUDAISM AMONGST JEWISH TEENAGERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN SUCH MANNER AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE AND; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
146 New London Road
Chelmsford
Essex
CM2 0AW
- Phone:
- 02082026698
- Email:
- office@bbyo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window