THE ARTS SOCIETY CRANLEIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society is a member of the The Arts Society and provides talks by nationally accredited speakers. The Society also organises several visits each year, actively supports Young Arts and runs Church Recording and Church Trail projects from time to time as part of The Arts Society programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 June 2011: Standard registration
- CRANLEIGH DFAS (Working name)
- CRANLEIGH DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Enid Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Arvon Chapman | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan Kenneth Halder | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Iris Camfield | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norma Halder | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAERWEN HARRIES | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEBBIE GAUVAIN | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS GWEN WRIGHT BED | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.51k | £20.89k | £7.62k | £23.06k | £23.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.13k | £13.20k | £15.36k | £24.85k | £19.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 25 OCT 2017 as amended on 28 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS. B) THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ARTISTIC HERITAGE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rumbeams Farm
The Green
Ewhurst
CRANLEIGH
Surrey
GU6 7RR
- Phone:
- 01483271667
- Email:
- DEBBIE.GAUVAIN@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window