Financial history MOUNT ELIM EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1141828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £59.40k £75.57k £438.00k £302.86k £307.39k
Total expenditure £58.63k £91.80k £110.00k £356.84k £599.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £125.00k £70.00k