Trustees THE SHAW LANE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1140880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Clay Chair 01 April 2022
None on record
Glen Banks Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Timothy Bell Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Joanne Battye Trustee 06 April 2024
None on record
Martyn Walter Sagar Trustee 06 April 2024
None on record
Judith Brock Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Christopher Reeves Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Lynsey Bloomer Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
MICHAEL DEWSNAP Trustee 24 March 2011
ACTIVE BARNSLEY
Received: On time
BARNSLEY BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT SERVICE
Received: On time
IAN MEADE Trustee 24 March 2011
None on record