Financial history BNOS ZION D'BOBOV LIMITED

Charity number: 1142069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.96m £1.70m £2.51m £3.50m £2.27m
Total expenditure £1.31m £1.65m £1.78m £3.53m £2.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £631.79k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.94m £565.32k £1.33m £2.24m £788.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.87k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.13m £1.18m £1.25m £1.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.31k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.89k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £973.82k £1.65m £1.75m £2.34m £2.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £310.85k £0 £0 £1.18m £12.04k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.00k £0 £14.03k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £17.99k £1.64m £612.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £33.12k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £23.11k £0 £30.57k £15.11k £16.31k