RAPHA MEDICA PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rapha Medica Project supports a small skilled and dedicated team who provide vital medical care for a remote community of people on the Mambilla Plateau in Nigeria, population 750,000. The next nearest qualified medical help is more than a 7 hour motor journey away. We raise funds to provide infrastructure, equipment and medical disposables.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nigeria
Governance
- 19 December 2011: Standard registration
- RMP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN MARTIN RUSSELL | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|||
CYRIL MEREDITH | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £8.00k | £7.70k | £10.06k | £11.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.23k | £9.12k | £10.88k | £9.35k | £10.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES OF THE PEOPLE IN THE MAMBILLA PLATEAU REGION OF NIGERIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK AND ACTIVITIES OF THE RAPHA MEDICAL OUTREACH PROJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Barn
Withybridge Lane
Cheltenham
GL51 0TH
- Phone:
- 07765171061
- Email:
- info@raphamedica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window