Financial history BOWDON PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1142325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.18m £2.24m £2.63m £2.77m £3.65m
Total expenditure £2.60m £2.38m £2.49m £2.72m £3.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.18m £2.24m £2.63m £2.75m £3.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.92k £1.15k £940 £17.70k £40.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.60m £2.38m £2.49m £2.72m £3.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £45.15k £42.62k £37.17k £42.34k £78.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0